12/02/2048 |
Joined the Allis-Chalmers Engines. |
01/01/2049 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 3 (5); Power: 2 (3); Eye: 2 (4). |
01/01/2050 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 3 (5); Power: 2 (3); Eye: 3 (4). |
01/01/2051 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 4 (5); Power: 2 (3); Eye: 3 (4). |
05/04/2051 |
Released by the Allis-Chalmers Engines. |
05/04/2051 |
Drafted in the 2051 first-year player draft (Round 8, Pick 11, 248th overall pick) by the El Paso Chilis. |
01/01/2052 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 4 (5); Power: 2 (3); Eye: 3 (4). |
05/26/2052 |
Released by the El Paso organization. |
01/01/2053 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 5 (5); Power: 2 (3); Eye: 3 (4). |
05/14/2053 |
Signed a minor league contract with the Twin Cities River Monsters organization. |
01/01/2054 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 5 (5); Power: 2 (3); Eye: 3 (4). |
06/21/2054 |
Injured (elbow contusion),day-to-day for 2 weeks. |
01/01/2055 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 5 (5); Power: 2 (3); Eye: 3 (4). |
01/01/2056 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 5 (5); Power: 2 (3); Eye: 4 (4). |
05/17/2056 |
Injured (bruised thumb),day-to-day for one week. |
09/20/2056 |
Wins the 2056 Charley Pegler League Pegler Series with the Billings Cowboys! |
01/01/2057 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 5 (5); Power: 2 (2); Eye: 3 (4). |
06/03/2057 |
Released by the Twin Cities River Monsters. |
11/03/2057 |
Retired from professional baseball. |