12/02/2049 |
Joined the American General Generals. |
01/01/2050 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 3 (4); Power: 3 (3); Eye: 5 (6). |
01/01/2051 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 3 (4); Power: 3 (3); Eye: 6 (6). |
01/01/2052 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 4 (4); Power: 3 (3); Eye: 6 (6). |
05/19/2052 |
Released by the American General Generals. |
05/19/2052 |
Drafted in the 2052 first-year player draft (Round 16, Pick 23, 525th overall pick) by the Phoenix Talons. |
09/13/2052 |
Wins the 2052 Angela Drake League Supremacy Series with the Daytona Beach Cruisers! |
01/01/2053 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 4 (4); Power: 3 (3); Eye: 6 (6). |
05/12/2053 |
Released by the Phoenix organization. |
12/09/2053 |
Signed a minor league contract with the Calgary Pioneers organization. |
01/01/2054 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 5 (5); Power: 3 (3); Eye: 6 (6). |
01/01/2055 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 5 (5); Power: 3 (3); Eye: 6 (6). |
01/01/2056 |
OSA scouting updated ratings (potential): Contact: 4 (4); Power: 3 (3); Eye: 6 (6). |
08/12/2056 |
Released by the Calgary Pioneers. |
11/08/2056 |
Retired from professional baseball. |